Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County – Memorial Hospital – Board Membership and Meetings
Sponsored by
Delegate Beitzel
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Board of Governors of the Garrett County Memorial Hospital; altering the terms of the members of the Board; and reducing the mandatory number of Board meetings from 10 to 6.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0804
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Garrett County – Memorial Hospital – Board Membership and Meetings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Garrett County – Memorial Hospital – Board Membership and Meetings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Garrett County – Memorial Hospital – Board Membership and Meetings
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Garrett County – Memorial Hospital – Board Membership and Meetings
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Returned Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Text - Chapter - Garrett County – Memorial Hospital – Board Membership and Meetings
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:17 PM
Click to return on the top page