Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Off-Label Use - Promotion
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Morgan, Arikan, Chisholm, Grammer, McComas, and Nawrocki
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing pharmaceutical manufacturers and representatives of pharmaceutical manufacturers to engage in the truthful promotion of off-label uses for drugs, biological products, and devices; and prohibiting certain persons from taking certain enforcement and disciplinary action against a pharmaceutical manufacturer, representative of a pharmaceutical manufacturer, or health care provider for engaging in a truthful promotion of an off-label use of a drug, biological product, or device.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Off-Label Use - Promotion
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Off-Label Use - Promotion
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2024 2/28/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   21-218.1 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:20 PM
Click to return on the top page