Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Information Technology - Evaluation and Development of a 3-1-1 Portal Using Artificial Intelligence
Sponsored by
Delegates Kerr, Pena-Melnyk, Cullison, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Chisholm, Guzzone, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kipke, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, Rosenberg, Taveras, White Holland, and Woods
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Stating the intent of the General Assembly that the Department of Information Technology evaluate the feasibility of creating a virtual 3-1-1 portal as a source for Maryland residents to obtain nonemergency government information and services utilizing artificial intelligence and that the Department prioritize the creation of the portal if feasible.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1068
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {353026/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-5)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Human Services - 2-1-1 and 3-1-1 Systems - Nonemergency Information and Referrals
House 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Favorable with Amendments {353026/1 Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Information Technology - Evaluation and Development of a 3-1-1 Portal Using Artificial Intelligence
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (132-5) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Referred Rules 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/10/2024 4:11 PM
Click to return on the top page