Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Southern Maryland – University System of Maryland Partnership Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Southern Maryland Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing provisions that establish the Southern Maryland Higher Education Center and its governance; and making the Act subject to certain contingencies.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0903
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): March 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {664066/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {554138/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Southern Maryland – University System of Maryland Partnership Act of 2018
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {664066/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Southern Maryland – University System of Maryland Partnership Act of 2018
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments {554138/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Southern Maryland – University System of Maryland Partnership Act of 2018
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Text - Chapter - Southern Maryland – University System of Maryland Partnership Act of 2018
(   24-301 through 24-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page