Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing (Work Share Expansion Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Delegate Carey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 54
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "affected employee" for purposes of certain provisions of unemployment insurance law governing work sharing to include certain individuals who were rehired, subject to a certain limitation, by an affected unit following a temporary closure or layoff due to the COVID-19 pandemic; requiring the Department to ensure that the work sharing unemployment insurance program has sufficient staff and resources to complete the processing of complete applications within 10 days after receipt; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Opposite:
Finance
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0771
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {663490/1 Adopted
Proceedings
21AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 54
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing (Work Share Expansion Act of 2021)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments {663490/1 Adopted 21AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing (Work Share Expansion Act of 2021)
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Referred Finance 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Returned Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 54
Text - Chapter - Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing (Work Share Expansion Act of 2021)
(   8-1201, 8-1202, 8-1202.1, 8-1204 )
Last Updated: 4/15/2021 2:19 PM
Click to return on the top page