Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Opioid Overdose and Opioid-Related Emergency Medical Conditions - Treatment
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Buckel, Pena-Melnyk, Cullison, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Chisholm, Guzzone, Hill, Hutchinson, Kaiser, Kerr, Kipke, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Szeliga, Taveras, White Holland, and Woods
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring hospitals to establish and maintain certain protocols and capacity related to the treatment of patients who are being treated for an opioid-related overdose or opioid-related emergency medical condition; requiring hospitals to make a referral for patients who are diagnosed with opioid use disorder or administered or prescribed medication for opioid use disorder to an appropriate provider to voluntarily continue treatment in the community and work with peer support professionals for a certain purpose; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1071
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024, January 1, 2025
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hospitals - Opioid Overdose - Medication-Assisted Treatment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {973521/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {813427/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Hospitals - Opioid Overdose - Medication-Assisted Treatment
House 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments {973521/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/04/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Hospitals - Opioid Overdose and Opioid-Related Emergency Medical Conditions - Treatment
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Finance 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable with Amendments {813427/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Hospitals - Opioid Overdose and Opioid-Related Emergency Medical Conditions - Treatment
(   19-308.10 )
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 7:53 AM
Click to return on the top page