Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Caroline County – Sunday Hunting – Deer Hunting Seasons
Sponsored by
Caroline County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt deer on each Sunday of the deer hunting seasons from the first Sunday in October through the second Sunday in January, inclusive, in Caroline County.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0603
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Caroline County – Sunday Hunting – Deer Hunting Seasons
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Caroline County – Sunday Hunting – Deer Hunting Seasons
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-9)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Caroline County – Sunday Hunting – Deer Hunting Seasons
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Caroline County – Sunday Hunting – Deer Hunting Seasons
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (126-9) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:23 PM
Click to return on the top page