Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Liberty
Sponsored by
Delegate A. Jones
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to establish that every person, as a central component of the individual's rights to liberty and equality, has the fundamental right to reproductive liberty; prohibiting the State from directly or indirectly denying, burdening, or abridging the right unless justified by a compelling State interest achieved by the least restrictive means; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State at the next general election to be held in November 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Constitutional Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1031 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Liberty
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Wivell) Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {393820/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (38-86)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Liberty
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-42)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Liberty
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Wivell) Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Floor Amendment {393820/1 (Delegate Wivell) Rejected (38-86) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Liberty
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (93-42) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Referred Finance 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/30/2022 5:37 PM
Click to return on the top page