Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nonprescription Drugs and Devices – Provision by Registered Nurses and Sale of Contraceptives Through Automatic Devices
Sponsored by
Delegates Williams, Embry, Fair, Love, Martinez, Palakovich Carr, Roberts, Ruff, Ruth, Simpson, Terrasa, Turner, White Holland, Woods, Young, Pena-Melnyk, Cullison, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Guzzone, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, R. Lewis, Lopez, Rosenberg, Szeliga, and Taveras
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the sale of natural membrane condoms, rather than all nonlatex condoms, through a vending machine or other automatic device; repealing a criminal penalty related to the sale of certain contraceptives by means of a vending machine or other automatic device; and authorizing registered nurses to provide, without a prescription, nonprescription drugs and devices in a local health department under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0944
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {193022/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (112-14)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Finance Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
4/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {763029/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-10)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Nonprescription Drugs and Devices – Provision by Registered Nurses and Sale of Contraceptives Through Automatic Devices
House 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments {193022/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/04/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Nonprescription Drugs and Devices – Provision by Registered Nurses and Sale of Contraceptives Through Automatic Devices
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (112-14) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Finance Judicial Proceedings 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 4/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable with Amendments {763029/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (121-10) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Nonprescription Drugs and Devices – Provision by Registered Nurses and Sale of Contraceptives Through Automatic Devices
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 8:49 AM
Click to return on the top page