Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Federal Public Service Loan Forgiveness Program - Employee Certification and Awareness Materials
Sponsored by
Delegate Lopez
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing requirements related to the certification of employment by public service employers under the federal Public Service Loan Forgiveness Program, including requirements regarding determinations of whether employees are full-time and the frequency with which the certifications are to be provided; and requiring the Student Loan Ombudsman in the Office of the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to develop and disseminate information to increase awareness of and participation in the Program.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Federal Public Service Loan Forgiveness Program - Employee Certification and Awareness Materials
House 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
(   3-101,   3-1801 through 3-1805 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:21 PM
Click to return on the top page