Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Pets in Housing Developments
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Foley, Harris, Lehman, Love, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an owner or agent of an owner of a housing development that on or after January 1, 2025, received an allocation of certain tax credits from the Department of Housing and Community Development from imposing certain prohibitions and costs related to a resident's possession of pets; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Housing and Community Development - Pets in Housing Developments
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Housing and Community Development - Pets in Housing Developments
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:21 PM
Click to return on the top page