Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Airport Noise Zones - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering eligibility for a certain property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on certain residential real property located within a certain airport noise zone; authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to choose to provide the tax credit only within a certain noise contour; authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to vary the amount of the credit based on where the property is situated within the noise zone; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0849
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Airport Noise Zones - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {655060/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clark) Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {453028/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (39-92)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Airport Noise Zones - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-28)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {799632/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Motion to Reconsider Committee Amendment (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Committee Amendment {799632/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Credit - Airport Noise Zones - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Airport Noise Zones - Eligibility
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {655060/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Clark) Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {453028/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (39-92) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Airport Noise Zones - Eligibility
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (109-28) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {799632/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Motion to Reconsider Committee Amendment (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Committee Amendment {799632/1 Withdrawn 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Credit - Airport Noise Zones - Eligibility
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:30 PM
Click to return on the top page