Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Information Technology - Modernization of Information Technology Projects
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Chisholm, Cullison, Guzzone, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kerr, Kipke, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Reilly, Rosenberg, Szeliga, Taveras, White Holland, and Woods
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the duties of the Secretary of Information Technology related to modernization of information technology systems; renaming the Major Information Technology Development Fund to be the Information Technology Investment Fund; requiring a certain amount of the Fund to be set aside for certain projects each fiscal year; requiring the Board of Public Works to expedite the placement on an agenda and approval of certain contracts; and altering the name, duties, and membership of the Modernize Maryland Oversight Commission.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0982
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203229/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - Information Technology - Modernization of Information Technology Projects
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable with Amendments {203229/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Information Technology - Modernization of Information Technology Projects
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Referred Rules 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 8:48 AM
Click to return on the top page