Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County – Board of Education – Redetermination of Geographic Attendance Area Ho. Co. 05-21
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 396
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Howard County Board of Education to submit to the General Assembly and the Howard County Delegation to the General Assembly an annual report on the program capacity of each permanent school facility, beginning in the 2021-2022 school year; requiring the county board to submit a report to the General Assembly and the Howard County Delegation on a plan to adjust student enrollment to meet target utilization, if student enrollment at a permanent school facility is not within 10% of target utilization; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-4)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 396
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Howard County – Board of Education – Redetermination of Geographic Attendance Area Ho. Co. 05-21
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Howard County – Board of Education – Redetermination of Geographic Attendance Area Ho. Co. 05-21
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-4) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 396
Text - Chapter - Howard County – Board of Education – Redetermination of Geographic Attendance Area Ho. Co. 05-21
(   4-138 )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:21 AM
Click to return on the top page