Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Facility Operations - Crimes of Moral Turpitude and Value of Table Game Chips - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Feldmark, Griffith, Atterbeary, Bartlett, Buckel, Davis, Hill, J. Long, Roberts, Stewart, Terrasa, Wu, and Ziegler
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission is required to disqualify an applicant who committed a certain crime involving moral turpitude from holding a video lottery employee license.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {313025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Video Lottery Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude - Alterations
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2024 3/06/2024 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/07/2024 2/28/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Video Lottery Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude - Alterations
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 2/28/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Favorable with Amendments {313025/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Video Lottery Facility Operations - Crimes of Moral Turpitude and Value of Table Game Chips - Alterations
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 9:44 AM
Click to return on the top page