Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Rogers
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a tobacco product manufacturer and a certain electronic smoking devices manufacturer to pay a certification fee of $1,000; authorizing the Executive Director of the Alcohol, Tobacco, and Cannabis Commission and the Attorney General to take certain action relating to the licensure of certain electronic smoking devices manufacturers, wholesalers, importers, and retailers and vape shop vendors in certain circumstances; requiring the Attorney General to develop and make available to the public a certain directory; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:22 PM
Click to return on the top page