Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Academic Credit for Prior Learning in Higher Education
Sponsored by
Delegate Solomon
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Credit for Prior Learning in Higher Education; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before July 1, 2022; and terminating the Act after September 30, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2021
Legislative Date
2/21/2021
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Task Force to Study Academic Credit for Prior Learning in Higher Education
House 2/21/2021 2/21/2021 Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:25 PM
Click to return on the top page