Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Common Ownership Communities - Reserve Studies - Exemptions
Sponsored by
Delegates Adams, Chisholm, Hornberger, Hutchinson, Kipke, and Tomlinson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Exempting cooperative housing corporations, condominiums, and homeowners associations from conducting reserve studies on the vote of at least two-thirds of the members or owners.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1050
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Common Ownership Communities - Reserve Studies - Exemptions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Common Ownership Communities - Reserve Studies - Exemptions
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:22 PM
Click to return on the top page