Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Sponsored by
Delegates Crosby, Clark, Boyce, Barve, and Stein
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing various programs, goals, research requirements, planning requirements, and funding requirements related to oyster spat, oyster shells, and oyster substrate; requiring the Maryland Agricultural and Resource-Based Industry Development Corporation to provide loans up to $250,000 to finance the eligible costs of certain eligible seafood processing projects; replacing the oyster shell recycling tax credit with an annual grant program administered by the Department of Natural Resources; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0830
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022, July 1, 2023
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {103622/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Mautz) Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {313326/1 (Delegate Long) Rejected (12-100)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-41)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-5)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments {103622/1 Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Mautz) Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Floor Amendment {313326/1 (Delegate Long) Rejected (12-100) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (90-41) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (42-5) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources – Oysters – Spat, Shells, and Substrate
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:37 PM
Click to return on the top page