Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Plastic and Glass Products - Postconsumer Recycled Content Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Terrasa, Stein, and Ruth
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain producers of certain plastic and glass products from selling, offering for sale, or distributing the products to any person in the State unless certain conditions are met; requiring certain producers of certain plastic and glass products to, individually or as part of a representative organization, register and pay an annual registration fee of $1,000 to the Department of the Environment; establishing certain minimum postconsumer recycled content percentage requirements for certain products; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Environment - Plastic and Glass Products - Postconsumer Recycled Content Program
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
(   9-1702,   9-1707,   9-2401 through 9-2413 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:38 PM
Click to return on the top page