Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz, Adams, Arentz, Hornberger, Jacobs, and McComas
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program in the Maryland Agricultural and Resource-Based Industry Development Corporation to provide loans to qualified commercial fishermen to continue commercial operations in the State; providing, beginning July 1, 2025, that generational watermen, beginner watermen, and seafood processing businesses are eligible to receive loans under the Program; requiring a loan made under the Program to be at least $7,000 and not more than $15,000; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0826
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Watermen's Microloan Program - Establishment
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:38 PM
Click to return on the top page