Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Credit for Longtime Residents to Offset Property Tax Rate Increase
Sponsored by
Delegates Metzgar, Anderton, Buckel, Chisholm, Ciliberti, Griffith, Hartman, Mangione, McComas, Miller, Munoz, Schmidt, Tomlinson, Valentine, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the county or municipal property tax imposed on a dwelling owned by an individual who is at least 60 years old, who has resided in the dwelling for 30 consecutive years, and whose combined income does not exceed $75,000; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2024.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0738 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax - Credit for Longtime Residents to Offset Property Tax Rate Increase
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:24 PM
Click to return on the top page