Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Death Benefits (Patricia Ann "Pat" Osburn Law)
Sponsored by
Calvert County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a volunteer of certain fire and rescue entities in Calvert County who dies in the line of duty is eligible for a death benefit of $6,000 under certain circumstances; altering a certain definition; and providing for the retroactive application of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Death Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184061/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {509632/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Death Benefits
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {184061/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Death Benefits (Patricia Ann "Pat" Osburn Law)
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/24/2019 3/24/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/24/2019 3/24/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {509632/1 Adopted 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Death Benefits (Patricia Ann "Pat" Osburn Law)
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Text - Chapter - Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Death Benefits (Patricia Ann "Pat" Osburn Law)
(   14-101, 14-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page