Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Information Technology - Artificial Intelligence - Policies and Procedures (Artificial Intelligence Governance Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Delegates J. Lewis, Hill, Kaiser, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Chisholm, Cullison, Guzzone, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kerr, Kipke, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Reilly, Rosenberg, Szeliga, Taveras, White Holland, and Woods
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each unit of State government to conduct certain inventories and assessments by December 1, 2024, and annually thereafter; prohibiting the Department of Information Technology from making certain information publicly available under certain circumstances; prohibiting a unit of State government from deploying or using a system that employs artificial intelligence under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0818
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273227/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Information Technology - Artificial Intelligence - Policies and Procedures (Artificial Intelligence Governance Act of 2024)
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Favorable with Amendments {273227/1 Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Information Technology - Artificial Intelligence - Policies and Procedures (Artificial Intelligence Governance Act of 2024)
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Referred Rules 66 Click to view Recorded Media
(   13-116, 3.5-101,   3.5-301,   3.5-303,   3.5-318, 3.5-801 through 3.5-806 )
Last Updated: 4/10/2024 4:11 PM
Click to return on the top page