Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel, Beitzel, McKay, Anderton, and Corderman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Defining "Tier 1 county" as a county exceeding certain unemployment rates and with less than or equal to 75% of the median State income during certain periods; repealing a certain start-up tax credit under the One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credit Program; expanding the eligibility requirements for a certain project tax credit by altering, under certain circumstances, the number of qualified positions that a qualified business entity is required to create; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0989
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {915769/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {785669/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {469034/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {915769/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Floor Committee Amendment {785669/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Referred Rules 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments {469034/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Text - Chapter - One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration
(   1-101, 6-401 through 6-403, 6-404, 6-405, 6-406, 6-407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page