Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Offshore Wind Projects - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilson and Crosby
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission on June 1, 2024, to open a revised Round 2 proceeding to evaluate certain offshore wind projects; authorizing certain offshore wind projects to submit certain revised plans for project schedules, sizes, or pricing, including offshore wind renewable energy credit pricing, and, under certain circumstances, to seek approval from the Commission to increase the maximum amount of offshore wind renewable energy credits sold under a certain order, subject to certain limitations; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1161
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electricity - Offshore Wind Projects - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {633020/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate Hartman) Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {163824/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (39-98)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {643227/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (39-99)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {943728/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (39-99)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electricity - Offshore Wind Projects - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-36)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {893023/1
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {893023/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {653828/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (14-31)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {253426/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (12-33)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-11)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-36)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Electricity - Offshore Wind Projects - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electricity - Offshore Wind Projects - Alterations
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/08/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments {633020/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2024 2/29/2024 Motion Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate Hartman) Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Floor Amendment {163824/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (39-98) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Floor Amendment {643227/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (39-99) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Floor Amendment {943728/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (39-99) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electricity - Offshore Wind Projects - Alterations
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Third Reading Passed (100-36) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/18/2024 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments {893023/1 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments {893023/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Floor Amendment {653828/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (14-31) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Floor Amendment {253426/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (12-33) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Third Reading Passed (34-11) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (97-36) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Electricity - Offshore Wind Projects - Alterations
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 3:00 PM
Click to return on the top page