Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Maryland Consumer Protection Act - Trade or Commerce Violations
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Office of the Attorney General)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the applicability of the Maryland Consumer Protection Act to include certain unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practices in trade or commerce, including any economic activity within the State that involves or relates to any commodity or service.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-38)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Maryland Consumer Protection Act - Trade or Commerce Violations
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Consumer Protection - Maryland Consumer Protection Act - Trade or Commerce Violations
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (101-38) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Finance 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:25 PM
Click to return on the top page