Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Cybersecurity Council - Election Security and High-Speed Internet Access
Sponsored by
Delegate Lisanti
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the duties of the Maryland Cybersecurity Council to include monitoring and evaluating certain election security measures and high-speed Internet access in the State; and requiring the Council to make recommendations concerning any legislative changes considered necessary by the Council to address election security and high-speed Internet access.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Cybersecurity Council - Election Security and High-Speed Internet Access
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing canceled
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:31 PM
Click to return on the top page