Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Coordinated Youth Violence Review and Response Team
Sponsored by
Delegate Attar
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Baltimore City Coordinated Youth Violence Review and Response Team to examine and prevent violence against youth through intensive case management; requiring that the review team be provided with access to certain information and records; establishing certain closed meeting, confidentiality, and disclosure requirements for certain information and records; authorizing police records concerning a child to be divulged to the review and response team; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City Coordinated Youth Violence Review and Response Team
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {903425/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City Coordinated Youth Violence Review and Response Team
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Baltimore City Coordinated Youth Violence Review and Response Team
House 2/10/2024 2/10/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2024 3/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments {903425/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/03/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City Coordinated Youth Violence Review and Response Team
House 3/15/2024 3/06/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/18/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:26 PM
Click to return on the top page