Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wasted Food Reduction and Diversion Fund and Grant Programs - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Boyce, Addison, Healey, Lehman, Love, Ruth, Stein, Stewart, and Terrasa
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the On-Farm Organics Diversion and Recycling Grant Program in the Department of Agriculture to award grants to eligible entities for on-farm organics recycling and compost use, wasted food prevention, and food rescue; establishing the Wasted Food Reduction and Diversion Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund and requiring interest earnings of the Fund to be credited to the Fund; establishing the Wasted Food Reduction and Diversion Grant Program in the Department of the Environment; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {353525/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-4)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Solid Waste Disposal Surcharge and Wasted Food Reduction and Diversion Fund and Grant Programs - Established
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable with Amendments {353525/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Wasted Food Reduction and Diversion Fund and Grant Programs - Established
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-4) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
(   1-701,   9-1701,   9-1725.1, 9-1725.2, 9-1725.3, 9-201   )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:26 PM
Click to return on the top page