Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation
Sponsored by
Delegate Atterbeary
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to issue certain licenses to certain qualified applicants to conduct or participate in certain Internet gaming operations in the State; authorizing the Governor, on recommendation of the Commission, to enter into certain multijurisdictional Internet gaming agreements; providing that certain payments to certain former video lottery employees may not be subtracted from the calculation of a certain benefit; submitting the Act to a referendum; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {863321/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {823325/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Nawrocki) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {553626/1 (Delegate Nawrocki) Rejected (35-95)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {803129/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (35-95)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {303226/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (37-91)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {603122/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (34-93)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {203321/1 (Delegate Foley) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-43)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/26 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments {863321/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Floor Committee Amendment {823325/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Delegate Nawrocki) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Floor Amendment {553626/1 (Delegate Nawrocki) Rejected (35-95) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Floor Amendment {803129/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (35-95) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Floor Amendment {303226/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (37-91) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Floor Amendment {603122/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (34-93) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Floor Amendment {203321/1 (Delegate Foley) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Internet Gaming - Authorization and Implementation
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Third Reading Passed (92-43) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
(   9-1A-28,   9-1A-29,   9-1F-01 through 9-1F-13 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:26 PM
Click to return on the top page