Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway - Toll Plazas
Sponsored by
Cecil County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Transportation Authority from making any capital investment in the John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway toll plaza; and requiring the Authority to remove the John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway toll plaza when it becomes functionally obsolete and establish a new toll plaza for the John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway at a location between Maryland Route 279 and Maryland Route 272.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0541
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority - John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway - Toll Plazas
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:31 PM
Click to return on the top page