Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development – Continuing the CORE Partnership Fund – Extension
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination of the Continuing the CORE Partnership Fund; and requiring the Governor to include an appropriation in the annual budget bill for fiscal year 2026 and each fiscal year thereafter of $50,000,000 to the Fund.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-32)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
4/03/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Housing and Community Development – Continuing the CORE Partnership Fund – Extension
House 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Favorable Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Housing and Community Development – Continuing the CORE Partnership Fund – Extension
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Third Reading Passed (104-32) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 4/03/2024 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/10/2024 9:32 AM
Click to return on the top page