Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Greater Baltimore Transit Governance and Funding Commission
Sponsored by
Delegate Bridges
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Greater Baltimore Transit Governance and Funding Commission to study and make findings and recommendations relating to the funding, governance, and performance of mass transit in the greater Baltimore region; and requiring the Commission to submit to the Governor and the General Assembly an interim report of its findings and recommendations by December 1, 2022, and a final report by December 1, 2023.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Greater Baltimore Transit Governance and Funding Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343921/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Greater Baltimore Transit Governance and Funding Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-19)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Greater Baltimore Transit Governance and Funding Commission
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments {343921/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Greater Baltimore Transit Governance and Funding Commission
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (114-19) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Finance 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Returned Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/21/2022 11:46 AM
Click to return on the top page