Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Competency Evaluations and Commitment Orders - Modification
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger and Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the procedures related to competency evaluations, including by requiring the Maryland Department of Health, rather than the court, to determine the basis on which a defendant will be examined; altering the definition of "designated health care facility" for the purpose of certain provisions of law governing the commitment of defendants who are found to be incompetent to stand trial; and extending the time period from 10 to 30 business days in which the Department is required to admit defendants who are found to be incompetent to stand trial.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Competency Evaluations and Commitment Orders - Modification
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Competency Evaluations and Commitment Orders - Modification
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/12/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:27 PM
Click to return on the top page