Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund to be the Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund; altering the purpose of the Fund to include making grants to federally qualified health centers, hospitals, and certain providers to increase access to prenatal care; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill certain appropriations for the Fund; requiring that priority for awarding grants under certain provisions of the Act be given to certain proposals; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0777
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health – Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Public Health – Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page