Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Packaged Ice - Testing
Sponsored by
Delegate Qi
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a person who manufactures packaged ice for sale in the State to conduct a test on the final packaged ice product for contamination once during a 3-month period, maintain a record of the test results for at least 2 years after the day on which the test was taken, provide the test results on request by a representative of the Maryland Department of Health, and follow certain procedures if the test shows that the packaged ice is not safe for human consumption.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Packaged Ice - Testing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Packaged Ice - Testing
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:41 PM
Click to return on the top page