Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Facilities - Disabilities and Juveniles - Community Relations Plans
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Attar, and Ruff
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that certain regulations adopted by the Department of Juvenile Services governing juvenile care facilities and juvenile detention facilities include a requirement for the establishment, implementation, and review of certain community relations plans that include descriptions of certain processes and procedures; and requiring certain State residential centers and private group homes to establish, implement, and revise certain community relations plans.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Facilities - Disabilities and Juveniles - Community Relations Plans
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Facilities - Disabilities and Juveniles - Community Relations Plans
House 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/29/2024 2/29/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:27 PM
Click to return on the top page