Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Sponsored by
Delegate Crosby
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission to plan and conduct observances in 2034 commemorating the 400th anniversary of Maryland's founding; requiring the membership of the Commission to reflect the diversity of the State to the extent practicable; requiring the Commission to meet at least twice a year; requiring the Commission to provide an update to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1, 2022, and each year thereafter on the plan of action for the commemoration; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0946
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873026/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 3/29 at 9:30 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable with Amendments {873026/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Historic St. Mary's City Fort to 400 Commission
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Rules 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
(   9-3301 through 9-3307 )
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 11:30 AM
Click to return on the top page