Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nonpublic Special Education Schools - State Contribution - Increase
Sponsored by
Delegate Korman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State contribution to the cost of educating children with disabilities in nonpublic programs to be increased for certain purposes by 4% in fiscal year 2023 over the amount approved by the State Department of Education in fiscal year 2022; and requiring the State contribution to be increased in fiscal year 2023 by not less than an additional 2% or the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers for certain purposes.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0958
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Nonpublic Special Education Schools - State Contribution - Increase
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {384161/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Nonpublic Special Education Schools - State Contribution - Increase
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {429530/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Nonpublic Special Education Schools - State Contribution - Increase
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Nonpublic Special Education Schools - State Contribution - Increase
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Nonpublic Special Education Schools - State Contribution - Increase
House 3/10/2021 3/11/2021 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {384161/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Nonpublic Special Education Schools - State Contribution - Increase
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments {429530/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Nonpublic Special Education Schools - State Contribution - Increase
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Text - Chapter - Nonpublic Special Education Schools - State Contribution - Increase
(   8-406, 8-415 )
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:22 AM
Click to return on the top page