Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions
Sponsored by
The Speaker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 55
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering certain policy and funding provisions and implementation dates relating to the Blueprint for Maryland's Future; requiring the State Department of Education to submit a certain report on information technology; requiring, beginning in the 2022-2023 school year, the Department to review schools where students continue to show learning loss related to the COVID-19 pandemic; requiring a certain workgroup for English language learners to study the effects of the COVID-19 pandemic; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0965
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {443826/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-37)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {413726/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {203126/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {983220/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (18-29)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {473120/1 (Senator Simonaire) Withdrawn
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (37-10)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-40)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 55
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions
House 3/10/2021 3/11/2021 Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 3/17/2021 3/16/2021 Rereferred to Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {443826/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (94-37) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {413726/1 Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Floor Amendment {203126/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Floor Amendment {983220/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (18-29) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Floor Amendment {473120/1 (Senator Simonaire) Withdrawn 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (37-10) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (93-40) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions
Post Passage 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 55
Text - Chapter - Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions
Age
(   15-127, 21-202,   21-204,   21-210, 5-201,   5-202,   5-212,   5-216,   5-217,   5-221,   5-222, 5-223, 5-224, 5-225, 5-226, 5-229, 5-230, 5-234, 5-235, 5-239, 5-402, 5-403,   5-404, 5-405, 5-406, 5-409, 5-410, 5-412, 5-413, 6-1002, 6-1009, 6-1011, 6-120,   6-124, 7-1A-03, 7-1A-04, 7-1A-08, 7-203.5, 7-205.1,   7-210,   8-201,   9.5-1002, 9.5-906, 9.5-907 )
(   2-218.1 )
Last Updated: 5/14/2021 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page