Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Amending certain prior authorizations of State Debt to alter the requirement that certain grantees provide certain matching funds; extending the termination date of certain grants; changing the locations of certain capital projects; altering the purposes of certain grants; changing the names of certain grantees; altering the authorized uses of certain grants; altering certain matching fund and expenditure requirements; repealing certain provisions that require grantees to provide and expend a certain matching fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Motion Re-referred Budget and Taxation Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {813827/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
House 3/10/2021 3/11/2021 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable Adopted 30AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Rules 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Peters) Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Motion Re-referred Budget and Taxation Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/25/2021 3/25/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Floor Committee Amendment {813827/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (46-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Text - Chapter - Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
(   2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2019, 2020 )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page