Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Public School Construction - Funding and Administration
Sponsored by
Delegate Harris
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that the State share of eligible costs for certain school construction projects that meet certain criteria is 100%; repealing the provision of law that would have repealed the School Safety Grant Program on June 30, 2026; reducing the appropriation for the Nancy K. Kopp Public School Facilities Priority Fund to $70,000,000 annually beginning in fiscal 2027; altering the uses of the Fund, giving the highest priority to schools with a severe facility issue; establishing the Workgroup on the Assessment and Funding of School Facilities; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools – School Safety Grant Program – Extension
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {533128/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {893523/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Schools – School Safety Grant Program – Extension
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments {533128/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools - Public School Construction - Funding and Administration
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Favorable with Amendments {893523/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (41-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Schools - Public School Construction - Funding and Administration
(   2022, 2023 )
Last Updated: 4/19/2024 2:10 PM
Click to return on the top page