Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric System Planning - Scope and Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Crosby
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the scope of certain policy goals with regard to energy systems; requiring the Public Service Commission to report on certain projects relating to certain goals; altering the scope of certain funds that may be used for certain projects; requiring the Commission to adopt regulations to require investment in certain demand-side reliability and efficiency improvement methods; requiring that certain regulations adopted and orders issued by the Commission be developed in a certain manner; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electric System Planning - Scope and Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {883420/1 (Delegate Crosby) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electric System Planning - Scope and Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-19)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273124/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {243429/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-37)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Electric System Planning - Scope and Funding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electric System Planning - Scope and Funding
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/12/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Favorable Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Floor Amendment {883420/1 (Delegate Crosby) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electric System Planning - Scope and Funding
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Third Reading Passed (116-19) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/18/2024 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments {273124/1 Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Floor Amendment {243429/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (101-37) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Electric System Planning - Scope and Funding
Last Updated: 4/16/2024 11:11 AM
Click to return on the top page