Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Highways - Proposed Expressway Expansion - Rail Evaluation
Sponsored by
Delegates Barve and Stein
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Transportation to evaluate the use of adjacent State rights-of-way for rail transit of any kind during the initial project planning phase for a proposed expansion of an expressway to add capacity.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Highways - Proposed Expressway Expansion - Rail Evaluation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Highways - Proposed Expressway Expansion - Rail Evaluation
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:42 PM
Click to return on the top page