Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George’s County – School Construction Master Plan Workgroup PG 514–18
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Prince George's County School Construction Master Plan Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to make recommendations based on its review of the FY2017 Educational Facilities Master Plan; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings by December 31, 2018, to the Prince George's County Executive, the Prince George's County Council, the Prince George's County Board of Education, the Interagency Committee on School Construction, and the Prince George's County House and Senate Delegations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0332
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Prince George’s County – School Construction Master Plan Workgroup PG 514–18
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 3:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page