Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact – City of Bowie
Sponsored by
Delegates Landis, Holmes, Howell, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the City of Bowie to participate in the Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact; and providing that the Compact is intended to provide for emergency management mutual assistance between certain jurisdictions and for mutual cooperation in emergency management-related exercises, testing, or other training activities.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0932
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact – City of Bowie
House 3/29/2022 3/30/2022 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact – City of Bowie
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Referred Rules 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable Adopted 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Second Reading Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:43 PM
Click to return on the top page