Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Vaughn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the collection and purpose of specified fees and revenues related to debt settlement services; repealing the termination date of the Maryland Debt Settlement Services Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0471
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016, July 1, 2016
Contingency - on enactment of another bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 48
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Finance 47A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
(   2011, 2014 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page