Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development – Business Projects and the Business Development Program – Financial Assistance
Sponsored by
Delegate McIntosh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Community Development Administration to provide certain forms of financial assistance for business projects; altering the requirements for a project to qualify as a certain business project; authorizing the Department of Housing and Community Development to provide certain forms of financial assistance under the Business Development Program; and authorizing the Department to sell or assign a certain equity interest without approval or execution by the Board of Public Works.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022, July 1, 2026
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-3)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {913626/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-7)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Housing and Community Development – Business Projects and the Business Development Program – Financial Assistance
House 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/04/2022 3/04/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Housing and Community Development – Business Projects and the Business Development Program – Financial Assistance
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Third Reading Passed (127-3) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments {913626/1 Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (41-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (125-7) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Housing and Community Development – Business Projects and the Business Development Program – Financial Assistance
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Text - Chapter - Housing and Community Development – Business Projects and the Business Development Program – Financial Assistance
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:43 PM
Click to return on the top page