Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dorchester County - Orphans' Court - Salary and Expense Allowance of Orphans' Court Judges
Sponsored by
Dorchester County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from $4,700 to $6,000, the salary of a judge of the Orphans' Court for Dorchester County; and increasing, from $800 to $1,000, the annual expense allowance of a judge of the Orphans' Court for Dorchester County.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0988
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Dorchester County - Orphans' Court - Salary and Expense Allowance of Orphans' Court Judges
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Dorchester County - Orphans' Court - Salary and Expense Allowance of Orphans' Court Judges
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Referred Rules 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:43 PM
Click to return on the top page